ME LD1540 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Amend the Tax Laws
Title
An Act To Amend the Tax Laws
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-538) thereto | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-538) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-07 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) As Amended By Senate Amendment "B" (S-538) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "B" (S-538) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) READ and ADOPTED | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-514) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Senate Amendment "A" (S-514) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) in concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) As Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-514) thereto in concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On further motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) As Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-514) thereto in concurrence | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland taken from the Special Appropriations Table | |
2010-04-07 | (S) On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence | |
2010-04-06 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-06 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2010-04-06 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-06 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-514) thereto. | |
2010-04-05 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2010-04-05 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-514) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-05 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-514) thereto ADOPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE | |
2010-04-05 | (S) On motion by Senator PERRY of Penobscot Senate Amendment "A" (S-514) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) READ and ADOPTED (Remarks Made) | |
2010-04-05 | (S) Subsequently Taken from the table by the President | |
2010-04-05 | (S) On motion by Senator PERRY of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) in concurrence | |
2010-04-05 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) READ | |
2010-04-05 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2010-04-05 | (S) Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) Report ACCEPTED in concurrence | |
2010-04-05 | (S) Taken from the table by the President | |
2010-04-02 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Unfinished Business | |
2010-04-01 | (S) On motion by Senator PERRY of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) Report in concurrence | |
2010-04-01 | (S) Report READ | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-754). | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (H-754) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Subsequently, The Committee Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2010-04-01 | (H) Speaker laid before the House | |
2010-03-31 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-30 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-26 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-25 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Unfinished Business | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Later today assigned. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) On motion of Representative PIOTTI of Unity, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) The Committee Report was READ. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) On OBJECTION of Representative PIOTTI of Unity REMOVED. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2010-03-23 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2010-03-22 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-12-21 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. | |
2009-12-21 | (H) Received by the Clerk of the House on December 17, 2009. |