ME LD154 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Name Bridge 2267 in the Town of Embden and the Town of Solon the Jotham and Emma Stevens Bridge
Title
Resolve, To Name Bridge 2267 in the Town of Embden and the Town of Solon the Jotham and Emma Stevens Bridge
Sponsors
Rep. John Ducharme [R] | Rep. Amanda Collamore [R] | Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] | Rep. Chad Grignon [R] |
Rep. Jennifer Poirier [R] | Rep. Thomas Skolfield [R] | Rep. Samuel Zager [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2021-03-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2021-03-10 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2021-03-01 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP |
2021-02-09 | Joint | Voted: OTP |
2021-02-09 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-01-19 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-19 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 19, 2021. |