ME LD1532 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 217 Yeas 24 - Nays 9 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Eliminate Single-use Plastic Carry-out Bags

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Eliminate Single-use Plastic Carry-out Bags

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-06 - Senate - Enactment RC #217 (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #186 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Adopt Hah-392 To Cah-378 RC #158 (Y: 50 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-30 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #157 (Y: 91 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 217 Yeas 24 - Nays 9 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
2019-06-06SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-05HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-04SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-378) in concurrence
2019-06-04SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-378) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-04SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-04SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 186 Yeas 24 - Nays 11 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-06-04SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-378) Report ACCEPTED
2019-06-04SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-03SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-03SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
2019-06-03SenateSenator LIBBY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2019-06-03SenateReports READ
2019-05-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-30HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-378).
2019-05-30HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-30HouseSubsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (H-378) was ADOPTED.
2019-05-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 158 (Yeas 50 - Nays 91 - Absent 7 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-30HouseSubsequently, House Amendment "A" (H-392) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-378) FAILED ADOPTION.
2019-05-30HouseOn motion of Representative STEWART of Presque Isle, House Amendment "A" (H-392) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-378) was READ.
2019-05-30HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-378) was READ.
2019-05-30HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-05-30HouseROLL CALL NO. 157 (Yeas 91 - Nays 52 - Absent 5 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-05-30HouseOn motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-30HouseReports READ.
2019-04-11SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence
2019-04-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-11HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES.
2019-04-11HouseCommittee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback