ME LD1520 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create an Aquaculture License
Title
An Act To Create an Aquaculture License
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-07-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-07-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-07-20 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-07-20 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-288) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-324) thereto. |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-07-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-288) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-324) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-288) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-324) thereto ADOPTED |
2017-07-20 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-324) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-288) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-07-20 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator RECONSIDERED whereby The Senate ADOPTED Committee Amendment "A" (H-288) |
2017-07-20 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED |
2017-07-20 | Senate | On Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT |
2017-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-288), in concurrence. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-288) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-288). |
2017-05-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-30 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-04-25 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES in concurrence |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee on Marine Resources suggested and ordered printed. |