ME LD152 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, Directing the Department of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife to Change the Term "Woodsman" to "Woodsperson" in the Junior Maine Guide Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, Directing the Department of Inland Fisheries and Wildlife to Change the Term "Woodsman" to "Woodsperson" in the Junior Maine Guide Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-28SenatePursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2023-02-17JointReported Out: ONTP
2023-02-06JointVoted: ONTP
2023-02-06JointWork Session Held
2023-01-17SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence
2023-01-17HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-01-17HouseThe Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
2023-01-17HouseCommittee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback