ME LD1518 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish a Fund for Portions of the Operations and Outreach Activities of the University of Maine Cooperative Extension Diagnostic and Research Laboratory
Title
An Act To Establish a Fund for Portions of the Operations and Outreach Activities of the University of Maine Cooperative Extension Diagnostic and Research Laboratory
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-12 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #284 (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #236 (Y: 85 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #236 (Y: 85 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-554) in concurrence |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-554) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 284 Yeas 23 - Nays 11 - Excused 0 - Absent 1 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator DIAMOND of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-554). |
2019-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-554) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-12 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 236 (Yeas 85 - Nays 54 - Absent 11 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-12 | House | On motion of Representative HICKMAN of Winthrop, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence |
2019-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |