ME LD1517 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Facilitate the Deployment of Small Wireless Facilities in Maine
Title
An Act To Facilitate the Deployment of Small Wireless Facilities in Maine
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Pierce [D] | Sen. Catherine Breen [D] | Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D] | Rep. Dennis Keschl [R] |
Rep. Nathan Wadsworth [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-363), in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-363) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-363). |
2019-05-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-28 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-04-11 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT in concurrence |
2019-04-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |