ME LD1508 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Ensure a Strategic Approach to Maine's Energy Transition by Imposing a Moratorium on Lithium Mining
Title
An Act to Ensure a Strategic Approach to Maine's Energy Transition by Imposing a Moratorium on Lithium Mining
Sponsors
Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D] | Sen. Pinny Beebe-Center [D] | Sen. Nicole Grohoski [D] | Rep. Nina Milliken [D] |
Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Rep. Lynne Williams [D] | Rep. Stanley Zeigler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-23 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2023-04-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee on Environment and Natural Resources suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1508&snum=131 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0963&item=1&snum=131 |