ME LD1506 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on February 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Make Additional Technical Changes to Recently Enacted Tax Legislation Concerning Pension Income
Title
An Act To Make Additional Technical Changes to Recently Enacted Tax Legislation Concerning Pension Income
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Fredette [R] | Sen. Bradlee Farrin [R] | Rep. Jared Golden [D] | Rep. Sheldon Hanington [R] |
Rep. Robert Nutting [R] | Rep. Stedman Seavey [R] | Rep. Heather Sirocki [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Timberlake [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2016-02-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-510), in concurrence. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-510) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2016-02-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2016-02-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-510). |
2016-02-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-02-09 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2016-02-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-12-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2015-12-23 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on December 21, 2015. |