ME LD1502 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-12 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Provide Consistency of Process for Maine's Electoral Votes by Prohibiting Enactment of the National Popular Vote Interstate Compact
Title
An Act to Provide Consistency of Process for Maine's Electoral Votes by Prohibiting Enactment of the National Popular Vote Interstate Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-08 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #154 (Y: 72 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-12 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 154 (Yeas 72 - Nays 59 - Absent 19 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2023-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative RIELLY of Westbrook, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-06 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2023-04-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-04-05 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |