ME LD1502 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-24 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Transfer Responsibility for Licensing of Land-based Aquaculture from the Department of Marine Resources to the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry
Title
An Act To Transfer Responsibility for Licensing of Land-based Aquaculture from the Department of Marine Resources to the Department of Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-17 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-05-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-17 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-17 | House | On motion of Representative KUMIEGA of Deer Isle, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-17 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED |
2017-05-16 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator MAKER of Washington The Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-04-20 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee on MARINE RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on MARINE RESOURCES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |