ME LD1492 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide More Choice for Maine Consumers in the Purchase of Spirits
Title
An Act To Provide More Choice for Maine Consumers in the Purchase of Spirits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-05-14 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on April 12, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1492&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0479&item=1&snum=130 |