ME LD1488 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Study and Recommend Improvements to Maine's Dam Safety
Title
Resolve, To Study and Recommend Improvements to Maine's Dam Safety
Sponsors
Rep. Arthur Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - Adopt Hah-470 To Cah-436 RC #188 (Y: 77 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2022-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-436) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-617) thereto. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-436) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-617) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-436) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-617) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-617) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-436) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby House Amendment "A" (H-470) was ADOPTED AND to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the same |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-436) was ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-436) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-436) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-470) thereto in concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-470) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-436) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-436) READ |
2021-06-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRENNER of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-436) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-470) thereto. |
2021-06-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-08 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-436) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-470) thereto was ADOPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 188 (Yeas 77 - Nays 61 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative BELL of Yarmouth, House Amendment "A" (H-470) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-436) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, the House RECONSIDERED its action whereby Committee Amendment "A" (H-436) was ADOPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-436) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-08 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-08 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative DUNPHY of Old Town, TABLED pending the motion of Representative TUCKER of Brunswick to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2021-06-08 | House | Representative TUCKER of Brunswick moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2021-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-07 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-12 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-12 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-12 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 12, 2021. |