ME LD1486 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify the Status of the Financial Industry Regulatory Authority and the National Association of Registered Agents and Brokers under the Maine Insurance Code
Title
An Act To Clarify the Status of the Financial Industry Regulatory Authority and the National Association of Registered Agents and Brokers under the Maine Insurance Code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2017-05-24 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-05-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-04-19 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-04-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee on Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |