ME LD1480 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Modify Retirement Plans for Fire Investigators and Sergeants

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Modify Retirement Plans for Fire Investigators and Sergeants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateSubsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2019-06-19SenateOn Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2019-06-14SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-13HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-13HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-12SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-568) in concurrence
2019-06-12SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-568) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-12SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-12SenateOn motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-06-12SenateReports Read
2019-06-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-12HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-568).
2019-06-12HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-12HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-568) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-12HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-12HouseOn motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-12HouseReports READ.
2019-04-04SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence
2019-04-04HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-04HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING.
2019-04-04HouseCommittee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback