ME LD1477 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Victims of Sexual Assault
Title
An Act To Protect Victims of Sexual Assault
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-29 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-29 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-03-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-436). |
2016-03-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-03-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-436) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-03-28 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-03-28 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-436) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-436) READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 18, 2015 and REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |