ME LD1472 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide for Economic Development with Offshore Wind Power
Title
An Act To Provide for Economic Development with Offshore Wind Power
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Kruger [D] | Sen. Emily Cain [D] | Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Sen. Erin Herbig [D] |
Rep. Ryan Tipping-Spitz [D] | Rep. Joan Welsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - Senate - Adopt Sds-321 To Cah-525 RC #346 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-26 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-26 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-26 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-525) as Amended by Senate Amendment "D" (S-321) thereto. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-525) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "D" (S-321) thereto, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-525) As Amended By Senate Amendment "D" (S-321) READ and ADOPTED , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | 22 Yeas - 13 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Roll Call # 346 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec Roll Call Ordered |
2013-06-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator YOUNGBLOOD of Penobscot Senate Amendment "D" (S-321) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-525) READ and ADOPTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE. (Remarks Made) |
2013-06-26 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-525). , in concurrence. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin, the Senate RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee "A" (H-525), in concurrence. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator CLEVELAND of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Cleveland, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-525) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-525) |
2013-06-17 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-17 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-04-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator Cleveland of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology, in concurrence. |
2013-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2013-04-30 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |