ME LD1466 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on February 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-25 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Sales Representatives Employed by Licensed Wholesalers
Title
An Act Regarding Sales Representatives Employed by Licensed Wholesalers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-02-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-02-18 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-18 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-357). |
2016-02-18 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-02-18 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2016-02-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-357). |
2016-02-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-357) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-02-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-02-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec the Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-357) Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2015-12-18 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on December 18, 2015 and REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |