ME LD1463 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Create an Automatic Voter Registration System

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Create an Automatic Voter Registration System

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-10 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #238 (Y: 19 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #181 (Y: 88 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-11SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-06-11HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-11HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-06-10SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-458) in concurrence
2019-06-10SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-458) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-10SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-10SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 238 Yeas 19 - Nays 14 - Excused 2 - Absent 0
2019-06-10SenateSubsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED
2019-06-10SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-06-07SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-06SenateUnfinished Business
2019-06-06SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report,
2019-06-06SenateSenator LUCHINI of Hancock moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2019-06-06SenateReports READ
2019-06-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-05HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-458).
2019-06-05HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-05HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-458) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-05HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-06-05HouseROLL CALL NO. 181 (Yeas 88 - Nays 56 - Absent 4 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-05HouseOn motion of Representative SCHNECK of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-05HouseReports READ.
2019-04-02SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2019-04-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-02HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
2019-04-02HouseCommittee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback