ME LD1462 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Serve the Public Interest, Promote Journalism and Save Jobs by Restoring the Sales and Use Tax Exemption for Publications
Title
An Act To Serve the Public Interest, Promote Journalism and Save Jobs by Restoring the Sales and Use Tax Exemption for Publications
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Babbidge [D] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] | Rep. Mark Bryant [D] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] |
Rep. Laurie Osher [D] | Rep. Paul Stearns [R] | Rep. Bruce White [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-14 - House - Recede And Concur RC #243 (Y: 82 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #312 (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #312 (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-14 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 243 (Yeas 82 - Nays 56 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-14 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-499) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-499) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-499) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 312 Yeas 23 - Nays 11 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-499) Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-08 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-10 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-08 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 8, 2021. |