ME LD1448 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify Certain Provisions of the Marijuana Legalization Act and To Deter the Use of Marijuana by Minors
Title
An Act To Clarify Certain Provisions of the Marijuana Legalization Act and To Deter the Use of Marijuana by Minors
Sponsors
Sen. Matthew Harrington [R] | Rep. Bruce Bickford [R] | Rep. Richard Cebra [R] | Rep. Paul Chace [R] |
Rep. Michael Perkins [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Pierce [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION in concurrence |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-13 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION. |
2017-04-13 | House | Joint Select Committee on Marijuana Legalization Implementation suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1448&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP1000&item=1&snum=128 |