ME LD1447 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require Training in Racial Issues, Racial Justice and Social Issues at the Maine Criminal Justice Academy and To Establish Additional Requirements for Law Enforcement Officers and Candidates
Title
An Act To Require Training in Racial Issues, Racial Justice and Social Issues at the Maine Criminal Justice Academy and To Establish Additional Requirements for Law Enforcement Officers and Candidates
Sponsors
Rep. Lori Gramlich [D] | Rep. Thomas Harnett [D] | Rep. Victoria Morales [D] | Rep. William Pluecker [I] |
Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D] | Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D] | Rep. Charlotte Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #703 (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2022-04-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-07 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-893) in concurrence |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-893) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 703 Yeas 29 - Nays 3 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-04-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-893). |
2022-04-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-05 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-893) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-05 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-07-19 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302. |
2021-04-08 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-04-08 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on April 8, 2021. |