ME LD1440 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Regarding the Department of Corrections and Correctional Services
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Regarding the Department of Corrections and Correctional Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #450 (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #385 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #385 (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 450V 133 having voted in the affirmative and 7 in the negative, with 11 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2015-06-30 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | LD 1440 In Senate, June 30, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 32 In Favor and 3 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2015-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-12 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-251). |
2015-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-06-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-06-12 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-251) . |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-251) READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-01 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-01 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |
2015-06-01 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |