ME LD1437 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-11 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Address Poverty by Increasing Access to Energy Efficiency and Weatherization Programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Address Poverty by Increasing Access to Energy Efficiency and Weatherization Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-11SenatePursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2023-05-05JointReported Out: ONTP
2023-05-02JointVoted: ONTP
2023-05-02JointWork Session Held
2023-04-05SenateOn motion by Senator Pierce of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on Housing, in concurrence.
2023-03-30SenateCARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-03-30HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-03-30HouseOn motion of Representative GRAMLICH of Old Orchard Beach, the Bill was REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on HOUSING.
2023-03-30HouseCommittee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback