ME LD1436 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-06 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, Directing Coordinated State Agencies To Engage with the Governing Leaderships of Portland Pipe Line Corporation and Montreal Pipe Line Limited for Sustainability-centered Repurposing of Stranded and At-risk Infrastructure Assets in Maine

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, Directing Coordinated State Agencies To Engage with the Governing Leaderships of Portland Pipe Line Corporation and Montreal Pipe Line Limited for Sustainability-centered Repurposing of Stranded and At-risk Infrastructure Assets in Maine

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #170 (Y: 87 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-06SenateFINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
2019-06-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-05HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2019-06-04SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-414) in concurrence
2019-06-04SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-414) READ and ADOPTED
2019-06-04SenateREAD ONCE
2019-06-04SenateOn motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York Report A Ought to Pass as Amended ACCEPTED.
2019-06-04SenateReports Read
2019-06-03HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-06-03HouseThe Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-414).
2019-06-03HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-06-03HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-414) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-06-03HouseThe Resolve was READ ONCE.
2019-06-03HouseROLL CALL NO. 170 (Yeas 87 - Nays 52 - Absent 9 - Excused 2 Vacant 1)
2019-06-03HouseOn motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
2019-06-03HouseReports READ.
2019-04-02SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence
2019-04-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-04-02HouseThe Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY.
2019-04-02HouseCommittee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback