ME LD1436 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Reduce MaineCare Spending through Targeted Nutrition Interventions
Title
Resolve, To Reduce MaineCare Spending through Targeted Nutrition Interventions
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Hamann [D] | Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D] | Rep. Dale Denno [D] | Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D] |
Sen. Craig Hickman [D] | Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] | Rep. Jennifer Parker [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #335 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-19 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-19 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-508). |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 335 Yeas 18 - Nays 17 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report in NON-CONCURRENCE. Roll Call Ordered |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-06-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-15 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-508). |
2017-06-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-508) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-15 | House | The Resolve was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-15 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-13 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |