ME LD1430 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on September 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Develop a Statewide Resource and Referral Center and Develop Hub-and-spoke Models To Improve Access, Treatment and Recovery for Those with Substance Use Disorder
Title
An Act To Develop a Statewide Resource and Referral Center and Develop Hub-and-spoke Models To Improve Access, Treatment and Recovery for Those with Substance Use Disorder
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #593 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2018-05-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 748. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2018-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-04-09 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-715) in concurrence |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-715) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2018-04-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 593 Yeas 33 - Nays 0 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reports Read |
2018-04-04 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-04-04 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-715). |
2018-04-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-04-04 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-715) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2018-04-04 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-04-04 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-04-04 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-13 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |