ME LD1424 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 29 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Establish a Special Retirement Plan for Department of Corrections Employees and Other Correctional Staff
Title
An Act to Establish a Special Retirement Plan for Department of Corrections Employees and Other Correctional Staff
Sponsors
Rep. William Pluecker [I] | Sen. Pinny Beebe-Center [D] | Rep. Traci Gere [D] | Sen. Matthew Pouliot [R] |
Rep. Jane Pringle [D] | Rep. Suzanne Salisbury [D] | Sen. Michael Tipping [D] | Rep. Sophia Warren [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-05 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-769), in concurrence. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-769) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-02-28 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2024-02-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-02-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-769). |
2024-02-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-02-27 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-02-26 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-01-30 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-01-30 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2023-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |