ME LD1419 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Inform Fair Minimum Rates of Wages and Benefits in Bids for Public Contracts Using State and Federal Data
Title
An Act to Inform Fair Minimum Rates of Wages and Benefits in Bids for Public Contracts Using State and Federal Data
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Rep. Benjamin Collings [D] | Sen. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D] | Rep. Traci Gere [D] |
Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Charles Skold [D] | Sen. Michael Tipping [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass Rpt RC #275 (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #151 (Y: 73 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - House - Acc Maj Ought To Pass Rep RC #151 (Y: 73 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-13 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-13 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED in concurrence |
2023-06-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 275 Yeas 22 - Nays 11 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2023-06-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator TIPPING of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2023-06-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-08 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 151 (Yeas 73 - Nays 62 - Absent 15 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2023-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative ROEDER of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-05 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP/ONTP |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-18 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING in concurrence |
2023-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee on Labor and Housing suggested and ordered printed. |