ME LD1419 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Support Health Care Providers during State Public Health Emergencies
Title
An Act To Support Health Care Providers during State Public Health Emergencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-06-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-16 | House | On motion of Representative HARNETT of Gardiner, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator CARNEY of Cumberland The Majority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-14 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on April 8, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |