ME LD1418 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 299 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 299 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ban the Purchase of Retail Marijuana and Retail Marijuana Products with Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Program Benefits
Title
An Act To Ban the Purchase of Retail Marijuana and Retail Marijuana Products with Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Program Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Senate - Enactment RC #299 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Acc Ought To Pass Rep RC #261 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - House - Acc Ought To Pass Rep RC #261 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 299 Yeas 35 - Nays 0 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2017-06-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT |
2017-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 261 (Yeas 147 - Nays 0 - Absent 3 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-07 | House | Subsequently, the Committee Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-07 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-16 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-05-16 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2017-05-16 | House | The Committee Report was READ. |
2017-05-16 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative HERBIG of Belfast REMOVED. |
2017-05-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-04-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2017-04-13 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-13 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2017-04-13 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-04-11 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-11 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-04-11 | House | On motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2017-04-11 | House | Joint Select Committee on MARIJUANA LEGALIZATION IMPLEMENTATION suggested and ordered printed. |