ME LD1417 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Expand Access to Head Start To Assist Opioid-affected and Other At-risk Families

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Expand Access to Head Start To Assist Opioid-affected and Other At-risk Families

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #98 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20HouseCarried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-06-20SenateCARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322.
2019-05-28SenateOn motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-23HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-23HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-21SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-265) in concurrence
2019-05-21SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-265) READ and ADOPTED
2019-05-21SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-21SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 98 Yeas 24 - Nays 11 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2019-05-21SenateOn motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-05-21SenateReports Read
2019-05-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-16HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-265).
2019-05-16HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-16HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-265) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-05-16HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-05-16HouseSubsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-16HouseSubsequently, Representative O'CONNOR of Berwick WITHDREW her REQUEST for a Roll Call.
2019-05-16HouseRepresentative O'CONNOR of Berwick REQUESTED a Roll Call. More than one-fifth of the members present expressed a desire for a roll call, which was ORDERED.
2019-05-16HouseRepresentative HYMANSON of York MOVED to accept the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2019-05-16HouseReports READ.
2019-03-28SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence
2019-03-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-28HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2019-03-28HouseCommittee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback