ME LD1413 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Equity in the State Income Tax Deduction for Certain Public Employees Retirement System Pensions
Title
An Act To Provide Equity in the State Income Tax Deduction for Certain Public Employees Retirement System Pensions
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Rafferty [D] | Rep. Christopher Babbidge [D] | Sen. Joseph Baldacci [D] | Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] |
Rep. Timothy Roche [R] | Rep. Paul Stearns [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #201 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-147). |
2021-06-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-08 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-147) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-08 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2021-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-07 | House | Later today assigned. |
2021-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative TERRY of Gorham, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2021-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-147) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-147) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-03 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 201 Yeas 24 - Nays 10 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-06-02 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2021-05-06 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on April 8, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |