ME LD1409 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-05 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-05 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding High-impact Electric Transmission Lines
Title
An Act Regarding High-impact Electric Transmission Lines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2022-01-03 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP |
2021-11-17 | Joint | Voted: ONTP |
2021-11-17 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-10 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on April 8, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1409&snum=130 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0459&item=1&snum=130 |