ME LD1408 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Allow Law Enforcement Officers To Wear Insignia on Their Uniforms To Indicate That They Are Veterans
Title
An Act To Allow Law Enforcement Officers To Wear Insignia on Their Uniforms To Indicate That They Are Veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-115). |
2019-05-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-115). |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-115) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-26 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |