ME LD1407 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Amend the Maine Insurance Code Regarding Payments by Health Insurance Carriers to Providers
Title
An Act to Amend the Maine Insurance Code Regarding Payments by Health Insurance Carriers to Providers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-790), in concurrence. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-790) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-03-06 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2024-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-790). |
2024-03-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-03-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-02-29 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-01-16 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-01-16 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered: TABLED |
2023-05-16 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence |
2023-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |