ME LD1406 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Encourage the Relocation of Persons from outside the State to Rural Maine
Title
An Act To Encourage the Relocation of Persons from outside the State to Rural Maine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - Enactment RC #813 (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #810 (Y: 7 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #810 (Y: 7 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-05-09 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2022-05-09 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to FAILING OF PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland asked and received leave of the Senate to Withdraw her motion for a Roll Call. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAUGHTRY of Cumberland Roll Call Requested |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 813 Yeas 15 - Nays 15 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Subsequently PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED FAILED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2022-04-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-649). |
2022-04-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-04-25 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-649) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-04-25 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-04-25 | House | On motion of Representative MATLACK of St. George, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2022-04-25 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-649) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-649) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-04-25 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator POULIOT of Kennebec Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 810 Yeas 7 - Nays 22 - Excused 5 - Absent 0 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin moved to Accept The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Reports READ |
2022-02-22 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-02-22 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2022-02-03 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-27 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on April 8, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |