ME LD1405 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - On motion by Senator DUSON of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - On motion by Senator DUSON of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Change How Adult Use Cannabis Excise Tax Is Calculated
Title
An Act to Change How Adult Use Cannabis Excise Tax Is Calculated
Sponsors
Rep. David Boyer [R] | Rep. John Andrews [R] | Sen. Eric Brakey [R] | Rep. Joseph Perry [D] |
Sen. Teresa Pierce [D] | Rep. Shelley Rudnicki [R] | Rep. Laura Supica [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-12 - Senate - Adopt Sbs-694 RC #715 (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Accept Report 'a' Ought To Pass As Amended RC #714 (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Report A Ought To Pass Am RC #455 (Y: 101 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Accept Report 'a' Ought To Pass As Amended RC #714 (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Report A Ought To Pass Am RC #455 (Y: 101 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator DUSON of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-04-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-16 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-04-15 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-15 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-834) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-694) thereto. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-834) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-694) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-834) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-694) thereto ADOPTED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 715 Yeas 29 - Nays 4 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec Senate Amendment "B" (S-694) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-834) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-704) READ |
2024-04-12 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 714 Yeas 29 - Nays 4 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock Report A Ought to Pass As Amended ACCEPTED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2024-04-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF ANY REPORT |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-04-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-02 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-834). |
2024-04-02 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-834) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2024-04-02 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2024-04-02 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 455 (Yeas 101 - Nays 41 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2024-04-02 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative PERRY of Bangor, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-02 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2024-04-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2024-03-20 | House | Later today assigned. |
2024-03-20 | House | On motion of Representative HASENFUS of Readfield, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Any Report. |
2024-03-20 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-03-19 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM/ONTP |
2024-01-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-25 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-22 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-05-31 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-05-31 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2023-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-30 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |