ME LD1403 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 10 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 10 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the General Assistance Laws Governing Reimbursement
Title
An Act To Amend the General Assistance Laws Governing Reimbursement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #234 (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #212 (Y: 84 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-06-07 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #212 (Y: 84 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special Session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2020-03-17 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special session of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 788. |
2019-06-20 | House | Carried over on the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | CARRIED OVER on the Special Appropriations Table to any Special or Regular Sessions, or both, of the 129th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1322. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-06-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-11 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-514) in concurrence |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-514) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 234 Yeas 20 - Nays 13 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator DILL of Penobscot the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-514). |
2019-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-514) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-06-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 212 (Yeas 84 - Nays 53 - Absent 11 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in concurrence |
2019-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |