ME LD1402 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 27 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 27 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Unobligated Balances from Amounts Appropriated for General Purpose Aid for Local Schools and to Require Annual Reports on School Demographics
Title
An Act Regarding Unobligated Balances from Amounts Appropriated for General Purpose Aid for Local Schools and to Require Annual Reports on School Demographics
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-28 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-859), in concurrence. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-859) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2024-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-03-27 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-859). |
2024-03-27 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2024-03-27 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2024-03-22 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2024-02-06 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-02-06 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2024-01-30 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2024-01-30 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-01-16 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-07-26 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-07-25 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2023-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-05-17 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-04-19 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2023-03-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-28 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-03-28 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |