ME LD1401 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-03 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Study Transmission Solutions To Enable Renewable Energy Investment in the State
Title
Resolve, To Study Transmission Solutions To Enable Renewable Energy Investment in the State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-03 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-30 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-369) in concurrence |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-369) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-05-29 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator LAWRENCE of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Reports Read |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-369). |
2019-05-28 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-05-28 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-369) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-05-28 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-05-28 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY in concurrence |
2019-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on ENERGY, UTILITIES AND TECHNOLOGY. |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee on Energy, Utilities and Technology suggested and ordered printed. |