ME LD1400 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Create the Bar Harbor Port Authority
Title
An Act To Create the Bar Harbor Port Authority
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Langley [R] | Sen. Ronald Collins [R] | Sen. Joyce Maker [R] | Sen. Kimberley Rosen [R] |
Sen. Stacey Guerin [R] | Rep. Brian Hubbell [D] | Rep. William Tuell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #518 (Y: 81 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #537 (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Adopt Hah-584 To Cas-347 RC #486 (Y: 25 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - House - Acc Ought To Pass As Amend Rep RC #485 (Y: 119 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Adopt Sas-349 RC #511 (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Adopt Sas-352 RC #510 (Y: 10 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Acceptance Of Report RC #508 (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #537 (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Adopt Hah-584 To Cas-347 RC #486 (Y: 25 N: 121 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-02-15 - House - Acc Ought To Pass As Amend Rep RC #485 (Y: 119 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Adopt Sas-349 RC #511 (Y: 11 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Adopt Sas-352 RC #510 (Y: 10 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Acceptance Of Report RC #508 (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2018-03-20 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 518V 81 having voted in the affirmative and 63 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2018-03-20 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-03-15 | Senate | LD 1400 In Senate, March 15, 2018, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 25 in Favor and 8 Against, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2018-02-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-20 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2018-02-15 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-02-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-347). |
2018-02-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2018-02-15 | House | Subsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (S-347) was ADOPTED. |
2018-02-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 486 (Yeas 25 - Nays 121 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2018-02-15 | House | Subsequently, House Amendment "A" (H-584) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-347) FAILED ADOPTION. |
2018-02-15 | House | On motion of Representative CHAPMAN of Brooksville House Amendment "A" (H-584) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-347) was READ. |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-347) was READ. |
2018-02-15 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2018-02-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 485 (Yeas 119 - Nays 27 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2018-02-15 | House | The Committee Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2018-02-15 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative CHAPMAN of Brooksville REMOVED. |
2018-02-15 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2018-02-13 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-347) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 511 Yeas 11 - Nays 24 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Subsequently Senate Amendment "A" (S-349) FAILED ADOPTION |
2018-02-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot Senate Amendment "A" (S-349) READ |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-347) ADOPTED |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 510 Yeas 10 - Nays 25 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Subsequently Senate Amendment "A" (S-352) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-347) FAILED ADOPTION |
2018-02-13 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-352) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-347) READ |
2018-02-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator BELLOWS of Kennebec RECONSIDER ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (S-347) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME |
2018-02-08 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-347) READ and ADOPTED |
2018-02-08 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 508 Yeas 25 - Nays 9 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Subsequently Report was Accepted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2018-02-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF REPORT |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Report READ |
2017-08-02 | House | Carried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138. |
2017-04-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Committee on TRANSPORTATION suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |