ME LD1391 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Treatment of Forensic Patients
Title
An Act Regarding the Treatment of Forensic Patients
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Malaby [R] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Sen. Eric Brakey [R] | Rep. Denise Harlow [D] |
Rep. Frances Head [R] | Rep. Deborah Sanderson [R] | Rep. Karen Vachon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2015-06-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Sent forthwith to the Engrossing Division. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-479) AND House Amendment "A" (H-487) , in concurrence. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-487) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-479) READ and ADOPTED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2015-06-22 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-22 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-479) and House Amendment "A" (H-487). |
2015-06-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-06-22 | House | On motion of Representative SANDERSON of Chelsea, House Amendment "A" (H-487) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-06-22 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-06-22 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-479) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-06-22 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-06-22 | House | Subsequently, The Committee Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-22 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-06-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-19 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-06-19 | House | On motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of the Committee Report. |
2015-06-19 | House | The Committee Report was READ. |
2015-06-19 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester REMOVED. |
2015-06-19 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-05-21 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-21 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2015-05-21 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-05-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-20 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-05-20 | House | On motion of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan, TABLED pending FURTHER CONSIDERATION. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator Burns of Washington REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-05-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE , in concurrence. |
2015-05-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-06 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY suggested and ordered printed. |