ME LD1387 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-11 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Clarity and Consistency in Routine Public Health Licensing Activities
Title
An Act To Provide Clarity and Consistency in Routine Public Health Licensing Activities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-11 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-371), in concurrence. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-371) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-06 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-371) |
2013-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-06 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-06 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator Craven of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2013-04-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |