ME LD1384 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend Article 9-A of the Uniform Commercial Code
Title
An Act To Amend Article 9-A of the Uniform Commercial Code
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Frey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2013-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-333), in concurrence. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-333) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-05 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-333) |
2013-06-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-05 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-05 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator Valentino of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Judiciary, in concurrence. |
2013-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |