ME LD1378 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Authorizing the Sale of the Guy P. Gannett House in Augusta for Use as a Museum
Title
Resolve, Authorizing the Sale of the Guy P. Gannett House in Augusta for Use as a Museum
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-06 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2013-06-04 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-04 | House | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-174). |
2013-06-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2013-06-04 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2013-06-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-174) |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-174) READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2013-04-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-09 | House | Resolve REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator Lachowicz of Kennebec REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed |