ME LD1370 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-14 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve the Quality of Teachers
Title
An Act To Improve the Quality of Teachers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - House - Insist RC #612 (Y: 83 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #661 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #653 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #661 (Y: 16 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-12 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #653 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2016-04-14 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-14 | House | RELEASED. |
2016-04-13 | House | HELD at the Request of Representative McCABE of Skowhegan. |
2016-04-13 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 612 (Yeas 83 - Nays 64 - Absent 4 - Excused 0) |
2016-04-13 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-432). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of the Minority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 661 Yeas 16 - Nays 19 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Motion by Senator MILLETT of Cumberland The Senate RECEDE and CONCUR With ACCEPTANCE of the Majority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-432) FAILED |
2016-04-12 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-12 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2016-04-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-432). |
2016-04-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-04-12 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-432) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-04-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-04-12 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-04-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 653 Yeas 19 - Nays 16 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Subsequently, On motion by Senator LANGLEY of Hancock The Minority Ought Not To Pass Report ACCEPTED |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-28 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not To Pass Report |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senator LANGLEY of Hancock moved to ACCEPT the Minority OUGHT NOT TO PASS Report |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-07-21 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-04-28 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-04-28 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |
2015-04-28 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS |