ME LD1367 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-01 - (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Improve Early Diagnosis, Treatment and Outcomes for Youth and Young Adults with, or at Risk for, Serious Mental Health Conditions
Title
Resolve, To Improve Early Diagnosis, Treatment and Outcomes for Youth and Young Adults with, or at Risk for, Serious Mental Health Conditions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-01 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #755 (Y: 94 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - House - Final Passage - Emer RC #737 (Y: 101 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #481 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #557 (Y: 90 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - House - Final Passage - Emer RC #737 (Y: 101 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #481 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #557 (Y: 90 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-01 | House | (Placed in the Legislative Files. DEAD.) |
2014-05-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 755V 94 having voted in the affirmative and 52 in the negative, with 5 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become law and the veto was sustained. |
2014-05-01 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2014-04-18 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 737 (Yeas 101 - Nays 44 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2014-04-17 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2014-04-17 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-04-17 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-553) thereto |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-553) thereto, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-553) thereto ADOPTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, Senate Amendment "A" (S-553) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) READ and ADOPTED, in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, Under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED ADOPTION of Committee Amendment "A" (H-717). |
2014-04-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York, Under suspension of the Rules, RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-717), in concurrence. |
2014-04-17 | Senate | TAKEN from the Special Appropriations Table by Senator Hill of York. |
2014-03-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator HILL of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2014-03-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-27 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) , in concurrence. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) READ and ADOPTED |
2014-03-25 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 481 21 Yeas - 13 Nays- 1 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2014-03-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reports READ |
2014-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2014-03-24 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-717). |
2014-03-24 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2014-03-24 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-717) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2014-03-24 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2014-03-24 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 557 (Yeas 90 - Nays 48 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) |
2014-03-24 | House | On motion of Representative TREAT of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2014-03-24 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-07-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-07-09 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 126th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1145. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator Gratwick of Penobscot, REFERRED to the Committee on Insurance and Financial Services, in concurrence. |
2013-04-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-04-09 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2013-04-09 | House | Committee on Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed. |