ME LD1358 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, Directing the Bureau of Alcoholic Beverages and Lottery Operations To Evaluate Direct-to-consumer Wine and Spirits Sales
Title
Resolve, Directing the Bureau of Alcoholic Beverages and Lottery Operations To Evaluate Direct-to-consumer Wine and Spirits Sales
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED, in concurrence. |
2022-04-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2022-04-25 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-04-25 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-614) thereto. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-614) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-614) thereto ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-614) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Under further suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) was ADOPTED |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE, in concurrence. |
2022-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2022-03-24 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2022-03-24 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-441). |
2022-03-24 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2022-03-24 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2022-03-24 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2022-03-24 | House | On motion of Representative CAIAZZO of Scarborough, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-24 | House | Reports READ. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) READ and ADOPTED |
2022-03-22 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2022-03-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec Report A Ought to Pass as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-441) ACCEPTED. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Reports Read |
2022-03-16 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/OTP-AM/ONTP |
2022-02-09 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2022-02-09 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-03 | Joint | Carry Over Approved |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Carry Over Requested |
2021-05-07 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate on April 5, 2021 and REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 |