ME LD1357 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-14 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act to Impose an Expanded Prohibition on Lobbying for Former Executive Branch Employees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act to Impose an Expanded Prohibition on Lobbying for Former Executive Branch Employees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-14SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2023-06-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-14HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2023-06-13SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2023-06-13SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-429), in concurrence.
2023-06-13SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-429) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2023-06-13SenateREAD ONCE.
2023-06-13SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2023-06-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-06-12HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-429).
2023-06-12HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2023-06-12HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2023-06-09JointReported Out: OTP-AM
2023-04-28JointVoted: OTP-AM
2023-04-28JointWork Session Held
2023-03-30HouseCarried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594.
2023-03-28SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence
2023-03-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-03-28HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS.
2023-03-28HouseCommittee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback